Global patent index - EP 1022424 A2

EP 1022424 A2 2000-07-26 - Spacer profile member for insulating glazing

Title (en)

Spacer profile member for insulating glazing

Title (de)

Abstandsleiste für Isolierglas

Title (fr)

Profilé espaceur pour vitrage isolant

Publication

EP 1022424 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101098 A

Priority

DE 19902067 A

Abstract (en)

The reinforcement (11) has a bending moment enabling the butyl strand to be formed to a dimensionally-stable frame.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Abstandsleiste für Isolierglas, die aus einem Butylstrang mit eingelagertem Trocknungsmittel besteht. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, für eine konventionelle Isolierglasstraße eine Abstandsleiste zur Verfügung zu stellen, die es gestattet, die Produktivität dieser Anlagen zu erhöhen. Diese Aufgabe wird erfindungsgemäß mit einer Abstandsleiste der eingangs genannten Art dadurch gelöst, daß der Butylstrang durch mindestens ein innen oder außen oder teilweise innen oder außen liegendes Verstärkungsprofil zu einer Stangenware stabilisiert ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/663

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/663 (2006.01); E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/66328 (2013.01); E06B 3/67313 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022424 A2 20000726; EP 1022424 A3 20010425; DE 19902067 A1 20010125

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI