Global Patent Index - EP 1022424 A3

EP 1022424 A3 2001-04-25 - Spacer profile member for insulating glazing

Title (en)

Spacer profile member for insulating glazing

Title (de)

Abstandsleiste für Isolierglas

Title (fr)

Profilé espaceur pour vitrage isolant

Publication

EP 1022424 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101098 A

Priority

DE 19902067 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022424A2] The reinforcement (11) has a bending moment enabling the butyl strand to be formed to a dimensionally-stable frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/663

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/663 (2006.01); E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/66328 (2013.01); E06B 3/67313 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022424 A2 20000726; EP 1022424 A3 20010425; DE 19902067 A1 20010125

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI