Global Patent Index - EP 1022427 A1

EP 1022427 A1 2000-07-26 - Door or window plus roller shutter assembly or similar

Title (en)

Door or window plus roller shutter assembly or similar

Title (de)

Tür- oder Fenster- und Rolladenbaueinheit oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Ensemble bloc porte, fenêtre ou analogue plus volet roulant

Publication

EP 1022427 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440357 A

Priority

FR 9900674 A

Abstract (en)

A door or window frame assembly (2) combined with a roller shutter housing (6) has the housing mounted on the upper cross-member (20) of the door or window fixed frame (4) so that the housing's inside wall (15) lies flush with a plane (21, 21A) passing over the inner face (22, 22A) of the fixed frame or opening frame (5). The lower surface of the housing is divided into two sections (18A, 18B) on different levels - one aligned with the lower surface of the external wall (10) and the other with the top of the fixed frame cross-member, with the shutter passing through a gap (19) between the two.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un ensemble porte, fenêtre ou analogue plus volet roulant, comprenant un cadre dormant (4) apte à recevoir un châssis ouvrant (5) et surmonté d'un caisson (6) de volet roulant. Selon l'invention, ledit caisson (6) est disposé sur la traverse supérieure (20) du cadre dormant (4) de sorte que sa paroi interne (17) se situe, sensiblement, dans le prolongement du plan (21 ; 21A) du cadre dormant (4) ou du châssis ouvrant (5), tandis que la sous-face (18) est subdivisée en deux tronçons de sous-face (18A, 18B) délimitant entre eux la fente (19) pour le passage du tablier, l'un (18A) de ces tronçons définissant, à l'extrémité inférieure (24) de la paroi externe (15), un retour en direction du cadre dormant (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/17; E06B 9/174

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17 (2006.01); E06B 9/174 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17023 (2013.01); E06B 9/1703 (2013.01); E06B 9/174 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] DE 4017248 A1 19911205 - DUBIEL WERNER [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022427 A1 20000726; EP 1022427 B1 20040908; DE 69919972 D1 20041014; DE 69919972 T2 20050915; ES 2226317 T3 20050316; FR 2788555 A1 20000721; FR 2788555 B1 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2226317

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69919972

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-04-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DOOR OR WINDOW PLUS ROLLER SHUTTER ASSEMBLY OR SIMILAR

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030307

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI