Global Patent Index - EP 1022439 A1

EP 1022439 A1 2000-07-26 - Steam or gas turbine casing

Title (en)

Steam or gas turbine casing

Title (de)

Gehäuse für eine Dampf- oder eine Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Carter de turbine à vapeur ou à gaz

Publication

EP 1022439 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810037 A

Priority

EP 99810037 A

Abstract (en)

The casing consists of a shell (2) and two flanges (3). The shell has different wall thicknesses in one upper region (5) facing away from the flanges, in two middle regions (6) and in two lower regions (7) facing toward the flanges. The upper regions are thicker than the lower ones, and the thickness of the middle regions is variable.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Gehäuse (1) für eine Dampf- oder Gasturbine. Es besteht aus einer Schale (2) und zwei Flanschen (3). Die Wanddicke der Schale (2) wird in einem oberen, den Flansch abgewandten Bereich (5), in zwei mittleren Bereichen (6) und in zwei unteren, den Flanschen zugewandten Bereichen (7) so variiert, dass der obere, den Flanschen abgewandte Bereich (5) gegenüber den unteren, den Flanschen zugewandten Bereiche (7) verstärkt ist. Die Wandstärke des mittleren Bereichs (6) ist variabel, so dass die beiden angrenzenden Bereiche (5),(7) stetig ineinander übergehen. Die unteren, den Flanschen zugewandte Bereiche (7) sind gegenüber den durch Schrauben befestigten Flanschen (3) und den teilverstärkten mittleren bzw. dem verstärkten oberen Bereich (6),(5) flexibler und wirken als Gelenk ausgleichend gegen Verformung vor allem in radialer Richtung. Das Gehäuse (1) bleibt dadurch in Betrieb deutlich runder. Das durch die geringere Verformung erreichte kleinere Radialspiel zwischen dem Gehäuse (1) und den Enden der Turbinenschaufeln führt zu einem deutlich erhöhtem Wirkungsgrad beim Betrieb der Turbine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/24; F01D 25/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/24 (2006.01); F01D 25/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/26 (2013.01); F01D 25/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022439 A1 20000726; EP 1022439 B1 20040506; CN 1261643 A 20000802; CN 1268833 C 20060809; DE 59909395 D1 20040609; JP 2000213305 A 20000802; JP 4347977 B2 20091021; RU 2244835 C2 20050120; US 6336789 B1 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59909395

2016-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909395

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909395

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-04-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909395 P 20040609

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI