Global Patent Index - EP 1022440 A2

EP 1022440 A2 2000-07-26 - Steam turbine plant

Title (en)

Steam turbine plant

Title (de)

Dampfturbinenanlage

Title (fr)

Installation de turbines à vapeur

Publication

EP 1022440 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100593 A

Priority

DE 19902810 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19902810C1] The steam-turbine plant (2B) includes a steam-generator (30), which has a separate preheating surface (82) as well as a superheater heating surface (52) connected into the water-steam-circulation (26) of a steam-turbine (22), and provided with a steam inlet (51). The pre-heating surface is joined on the input-side with a device (80) for generating separate or extraneous steam and on the output-side with the steam inlet of the superheater heating surface. The steam turbine may include a high-pressure stage (22A) which is joined on the steam outlet-side with the steam inlet of the superheater heating surface.

Abstract (de)

Eine Dampfturbinenanlage (2B) mit einem Dampferzeuger (30), der eine separate Vorwärmheizfläche (82) sowie eine in den Wasser-Dampf-Kreislauf (26) einer Dampfturbine (22) geschaltete Überhitzerheizfläche (52) mit einem Dampfeinlaß (51) aufweist, soll bei einer Einspeisung von Fremddampf (F) in den Wasser-Dampf-Kreislauf (26) einen besonders hohen Gesamtwirkungsgrad aufweisen. Hierzu ist die separate Vorwärmheizfläche (82) eingangsseitig mit einer Einrichtung zur Fremddampferzeugung (80) und ausgangsseitig mit dem Dampfeinlaß (51) der Überhitzerheizfläche (52) verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01K 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 23/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19902810 C1 20000525; DE 50011665 D1 20051229; EP 1022440 A2 20000726; EP 1022440 A3 20020807; EP 1022440 B1 20051123; ES 2253145 T3 20060601

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140113

2015-05-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140112

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011665

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140112

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011665

2014-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20140131

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253145 T3

2006-01-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011665 P 20051229

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040827

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI