Global Patent Index - EP 1022443 A1

EP 1022443 A1 2000-07-26 - Variable valve drive for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Variable valve drive for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur variablen Steuerung eines Ventils einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande variable pour soupape de moteur a combustion interne

Publication

EP 1022443 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99100855 A

Priority

EP 99100855 A

Abstract (en)

The variable control device for a valve (7) has a monitoring device (2) for the simultaneous checking of the cam contours of both camshafts, and an operating device (3) to transmit the movement of the monitoring device to the valve. The monitoring device is fixed to one end of a pivoted rod (4), the other end of which can turn on the operating device.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zur variablen Steuerung eines Ventils (7) einer Brennkraftmaschine mit zwei Nockenwellen (1a, 1b) zum Öffnen und Schließen des Ventils, deren Phasenlage zueinander zur Veränderung von Hub und/oder Öffnungsdauer des Ventils veränderbar ist, ferner mit einer Abtasteinrichtung (2) zum gleichzeitigen Abtasten der Nockenkonturen beider Nockenwellen und mit einer Betätigungseinrichtung (3, 22, 25) zum Übertragen der Bewegung der Abtasteinrichtung (2) auf das Ventil (7), wobei das Ventil durch eine Ventilfeder (19) in Schließstellung vorgespannt ist, ist die Abtasteinrichtung am Ende einer Gelenkstange (4) drehbar befestigt, deren anderes Ende an der Betätigungseinrichtung drehbar befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0047 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0659232 A1 19950628 - META MOTOREN ENERGIETECH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022443 A1 20000726; EP 1022443 B1 20010808; DE 59900189 D1 20010913

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110131

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900189

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110119

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110119

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-01-28 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Free text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 02/01 PAGES: 290 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-01-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010905

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900189 20010913

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990927

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI