Global Patent Index - EP 1022444 A2

EP 1022444 A2 2000-07-26 - Hydraulically controlled valve drive for a multivalve cylinder head

Title (en)

Hydraulically controlled valve drive for a multivalve cylinder head

Title (de)

Hydraulisch geregelte, zwangsgesteuerte Ventilhubbetätigung für einen Mehrventilzylinderkopf

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape à régulation hydraulique pour culasse multisoupapes

Publication

EP 1022444 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122366 A

Priority

DE 19858213 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19858213A1] The valve operating system includes a valve bridge (20) which has a mass inertia valve (20a). In its rest position, this valve separates the two piston-cylinder units (3b) from the lubricant circuit. When set engine revs. are exceeded, the connection to the lubricant circuit is restored by the inertia of the valve body (21) against the force of a compression spring (24).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine hydraulisch geregelte, zwangsgesteuerte Ventilhubbetätigung für einen Mehrventilzylinderkopf mit integriertem Ventilspielausgleich. Bei Brennkraftmaschinen mit mehr als einem Einlaßventil besteht bei geringen Drehzahlen das Problem, daß der Drall im Brennraum für eine gute Verbrennung unzureichend ist. Eine Verbesserung wird nur erzielt, wenn im niedrigen Drehzahlbereich nur ein Einlaßventil öffnet, so daß noch eine hinreichende Ansauggeschwindigkeit erzielt wird. Erfindungsgemäß wird dies bei zwei Einlaßventilen dadurch erreicht, daß in die Ventilbrücke 20 ein Massenträgheitsyentil 20a eingebaut wird, welches bei niedriger Drehzahl den Weg des Öls zur Kolben-Zylindereinheit 3b des Einlaßventils 2 sperrt, so daß der Druckraum der Kolben-Zylindereinheit 3b ohne Öl ist und das Einlaßventil 2 nicht öffnet. Der Weg des Öls zur Kolben-Zylindereinheit 3a ist dagegen ständig geöffnet, so daß das Einlaßventil 1 permanent betätigt wird und dort eine entsprechend hohe Einströmgeschwindigkeit auch bei niedriger Drehzahl realisiert wird. Bei steigender Drehzahl nimmt die Beschleunigung der Ventilbrücke 20 und des damit gekoppelten Massenträgheitsventils 20a zu, bis es gegen die Rückstellkraft einer Druckfeder 24 öffnet und den Weg des Öls über die Bohrung 25 und die Querbohrung 23 zu der Kolben-Zylindereinheit 3b freigibt, so daß auch das Einlaßventil 2 öffnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00; F01L 1/24; F01L 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F01L 1/24 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/183 (2013.01); F01L 1/24 (2013.01); F01L 1/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858213 A1 20000621; EP 1022444 A2 20000726; EP 1022444 A3 20010131; EP 1022444 B1 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59905064

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-04-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905064

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010210

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI