Global Patent Index - EP 1022448 A2

EP 1022448 A2 2000-07-26 - Two-cycle internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Two-cycle internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zweitakt brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion à deux temps

Publication

EP 1022448 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101454 A

Priority

JP 1569399 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides a two-cycle internal combustion engine which can realize scavenging by air, prevent blow-by of a fuel mixture in a scavenging stroke, and prevent combustion of a lubricating oil in a combustion chamber to thereby purify an exhaust gas. To achieve this, a two-cycle internal combustion engine 1 includes a compressor section (20) for performing a compression stroke in concert with a scavenging stroke by a piston (7) reciprocating in a cylinder (8). A fuel mixture from a carburetor (17) is pressurized to be supplied to a combustion chamber (12) by the compressor section (20). On the other hand, a scavenging air is also pressurized to be supplied to the cylinder (8) from its side wall by the compressor section (20). An oil pump (60) driven by a crankshaft (3) is provided to pump up a lubricating oil stored in a bottom portion of a crankcase, thereby lubricating the crankshaft with the lubricating oil supplied from the oil pump. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/02; F02F 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 33/02 (2006.01); F01M 3/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/38 (2013.01); F02F 1/24 (2013.01); F02B 1/04 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022448 A2 20000726; EP 1022448 A3 20010704; EP 1022448 B1 20041020; AU 1355500 A 20000727; AU 752366 B2 20020919; DE 60014978 D1 20041125; DE 60014978 T2 20050310; JP 2000213357 A 20000802

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070125

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014978 P 20041125

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031209

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02B 75/02 A, 7F 02F 1/24 B, 7F 02B 33/20 B, 7F 02B 25/04 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI