Global Patent Index - EP 1022452 A2

EP 1022452 A2 2000-07-26 - Accumulator fuel injection control apparatus and method

Title (en)

Accumulator fuel injection control apparatus and method

Title (de)

Akkumulator-Kraftstoffeinspritzvorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de commande d'injection de combustible du type à accumulation

Publication

EP 1022452 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100581 A

Priority

  • JP 1632399 A
  • JP 6028299 A

Abstract (en)

An accumulator fuel injection control apparatus and method which performs fuel injection control with high precision is proposed. This accumulator fuel injection control apparatus is equipped with detection means (14) for detecting an actual measurement value of fuel injection pressure of fuel injected into an engine (1), estimation means (22) for estimating a predictive value of fuel injection pressure, fuel injection amount calculation means (21) for calculating a fuel injection amount using either the actual measurement value or the predictive value, and fuel injection means (2) for injecting fuel into the engine based on the fuel injection amount calculated by the fuel injection amount calculation means (21). The detection means (14) measures the actual measurement value at a first timing (t1), and the fuel injection means (2) injects fuel at a second timing (t2). If an arithmetic processing of the actual measurement value measured at the first timing (t1) is in time for the second timing (t2), the fuel injection amount calculation means (21) calculates a fuel injection amount using a result of the arithmetic processing of the actual measurement value (S50). If the arithmetic processing is not in time for the second timing, the fuel injection amount calculation means (21) calculates the fuel injection amount using the predictive value (S46). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3809 (2013.01); F02M 63/0007 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0604 (2013.01); F02D 2250/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0693915 A 19940405 - NIPPON DENSO CO, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022452 A2 20000726; EP 1022452 A3 20020130; EP 1022452 B1 20031001; DE 60005575 D1 20031106; DE 60005575 T2 20040805; ES 2204365 T3 20040501

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120113

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120112

2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60005575

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120112

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120112

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110112

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110105

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-26 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20110104

2004-10-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204365 T3

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005575 P 20031106

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000210

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI