Global Patent Index - EP 1022460 A2

EP 1022460 A2 2000-07-26 - Mounting method

Title (en)

Mounting method

Title (de)

Montageverfahren

Title (fr)

Méthode de montage

Publication

EP 1022460 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100847 A

Priority

DE 19902259 A

Abstract (en)

The pump assembly process comprises pre-assembling several pump units (2a, 2b, 2c) along with displacement casings, induction valve, piston and compression valve; checking the pump units before fitting them in the pump casing for the required opening pressure of the induction valve; selecting the pump units in which the induction valve opening pressure is within a preset pressure interval and assembling the pump units of one group in the pump casing (6).

Abstract (de)

Offenbart ist ein Verfahren zur Montage einer sauggedrosselten hydrostatischen Pumpe mit mehreren Pumpeinheiten, bei der der Saugventilöffnungsdruck jeder Pumpeinheit vor der Montage ins Pumpengehäuse geprüft und lediglich Pumpeinheiten oder Saugventileinheiten eingebaut werden, deren Saugventilöffnungsdrücke innerhalb eines vorbestimmten Druckintervalls liegen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/48 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 23/06 (2006.01); F04B 49/22 (2006.01); F04B 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0404 (2013.01); F02M 59/48 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F04B 23/06 (2013.01); F04B 49/225 (2013.01); F04B 51/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022460 A2 20000726; EP 1022460 A3 20001227; EP 1022460 B1 20040324; DE 19902259 A1 20000727; DE 19902259 B4 20060223

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005753 P 20040429

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI