Global patent index - EP 1022461 A2

EP 1022461 A2 2000-07-26 - High pressure pump

Title (en)

High pressure pump

Title (de)

Hochdruckpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe haute pression

Publication

EP 1022461 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100848 A

Priority

DE 19902324 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has at least one pump unit driven by a drive shaft (22) and a displacement casing (6) in which a piston (12) moves axially with its sliding shoe (14) against an eccentric ring (16) supported by a support piston (24) transmitting motion to the main piston via a holding device (40). The support piston is indirectly or directly prestressed against the sliding shoe.

Abstract (de)

Offenbart ist eine Hochdruckpumpe, insbesondere eine Radialkolbenpumpe mit zumindest einer Pumpeinheit, deren Kolben über einen Gleitschuh auf einem Exzenterring einer Antriebswelle abgestützt ist. Zur Lagesicherung des Exzenterrings ist in der Pumpeinheit ein Stützkolben angeordnet, der über eine Druckfeder gegen den Exzenterring vorgespannt ist. Die Axialbewegung des Stützkolbens wird über eine Haltescheibe auf den Kolben der Pumpeinheit übertragen. Der Stützkolben liegt dabei direkt oder über die Mitnahmescheibe oder auf sonstige Weise auf dem Gleitschuh auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0439 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19727294 A1 19990107 - SAARBERGWERKE AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022461 A2 20000726; EP 1022461 A3 20010103; EP 1022461 B1 20041006; DE 19902324 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008042

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030901

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI