Global patent index - EP 1022465 A2

EP 1022465 A2 2000-07-26 - Hydraulically driven diaphragm pump

Title (en)

Hydraulically driven diaphragm pump

Title (de)

Membranpumpe mit hydraulisch angetriebener Membran

Title (fr)

Pompe à membrane à commande hydraulique

Publication

EP 1022465 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100956 A

Priority

DE 19901893 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19901893C1] The membrane is seen to be wavy in diametral cross section, the wavelength and/or amplitude varying with radius.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Membranpumpe mit hydraulisch angetriebener Membran (10a, 10b, 10c), die in radialer Richtung wellenförmig verläuft, ist die Anordnung derart getroffen, daß die Wellenlänge und/oder die Amplitude der wellenförmigen Ausbildung der Membran (10a, 10b, 10c) in radialer Richtung variabel ausgestaltet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/00 (2006.01); F04B 43/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/067 (2013.01); F04B 43/0063 (2013.01); F05C 2225/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19901893 C1 20000615; EP 1022465 A2 20000726; EP 1022465 A3 20001227; US 6327960 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI