Global Patent Index - EP 1022470 A1

EP 1022470 A1 2000-07-26 - Radial fan

Title (en)

Radial fan

Title (de)

Radialgebläse

Title (fr)

Soufflante radial

Publication

EP 1022470 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99100937 A

Priority

EP 99100937 A

Abstract (en)

The fan has two induction cavities, the first (A1) of which has an induction aperture (28), The induction aperture has an injector wall (20) extending into the first induction cavity to act as a feed injector. It is in the form of an annular wall, part annular wall or spoiler wall. and improves the achievable static pressure, working pressure and output.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Radialgebläse mit einem topfartigen Laufrad (10) vorgeschlagen, das an seinem Umfang mit einem Schaufelkranz (15) versehen ist. Ein das Laufrad (10) aufnehmendes Gehäuse (11) erweitert sich ausgehend von einem teilkreisartig gekrümmten, direkt entlang des Schaufelkranzes (15) verlaufenden Umfangswandbereich (19) schneckenartig in Drehrichtung des Laufrads (10) radial zu einem Auslaß (21) und besitzt zwei die axialen Stirnseiten des Laufrads (10) abdeckende Seitenwandungen, wobei eine an einer der Seitenwandungen angeordnete Trennwand (26) in das topfartige Laufrad (10) eingreift und dessen Innenraum in einen ersten und einen zweiten Saugraum (V1, V2) unterteilt. Dem ersten Saugraum (V1) ist eine Ansaugöffnung (28) zugeordnet, und der zweite Saugraum (V2) ist dem direkt entlang des Schaufelkranzes (15) verlaufenden Umfangswandbereich (19) zugewandt. Die Ansaugöffnung (28) ist mit einer sich in den ersten Saugraum (V1) erstreckenden, nach Art eines Förderinjektors als Ringwandung, Teilringwandung oder Spoilerwandung ausgebildeten Injektorwandung (20) versehen, die zur Verbesserung der erzielbaren statischen Drücke, des erzielbaren Arbeitsdrucks und der Gebläseleistung führt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/4213 (2013.01); F04D 17/04 (2013.01); F04D 17/16 (2013.01); F04D 25/166 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022470 A1 20000726; EP 1022470 B1 20041013; AT 279653 T 20041015; DE 59910827 D1 20041118

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-10-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041013

2005-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910827 P 20041118

2004-10-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030717

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI