Global patent index - EP 1022471 A2

EP 1022471 A2 2000-07-26 - Hydraulic valve with valve insert and valve cylinder

Title (en)

Hydraulic valve with valve insert and valve cylinder

Title (de)

Hydraulikventil mit Ventileinsatz und Ventilzylinder

Title (fr)

Soupape hydraulique avec insert de soupape et cylindre de soupape

Publication

EP 1022471 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100248 A

Priority

DE 19901889 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic valve has a valve seat (2) and a valve cylinder (3) which can be fixed separately in the casing (4) and removed from it. The valve cylinder has at least one threaded sector for this purpose. It also has a force transmission device for fitting in the valve unit and at least two sealing regions to seal the valve to the casing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Hydraulikventil insbesondere für Anbaugeräte, welches einen Ventileinsatz (2) und einen Ventilzylinder (3) aufweist und in ein Gehäuse (4) einer Hydraulikventileinheit (5) aufnehmbar ist. Der Ventileinsatz (2) und der Ventilzylinder (3) sind separat lösbar im Gehäuse (4) befestigbar. Ein weiterer Aspekt der Erfindung ist ein Ventilzylinder (3) für eine in einem Gehäuse (4) einen Ventileinsatz (2) aufnehmende Hydraulikventileinheit (5). Der Ventilzylinder (3) weist zumindest einen Gewindeabschnitt (6) zu dessen lösbarem Befestigen im Gehäuse auf. Weiterhin umfaßt der Ventilzylinder (3) mindestens eine Kraftübertragungseinrichtung zum Einsetzen in die Hydraulikventileinheit (5) und mindestens einen ersten (8) und einen zweiten (9) Dichtbereich zum Abdichten des Hydraulikventils gegenüber dem Gehäuse (4) in einem eingesetzten Zustand. Der erste Dichtbereich (8) weist eine Dichtfläche auf, welche formkongruent zu einer im Gehäuse vorgesehenen Gegenfläche ausgebildet ist. Der zweite Dichtbereich (9) wirkt mit einem Dichtelement (10) zusammen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/00; F16K 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/01 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0821 (2013.01); F15B 13/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022471 A2 20000726; EP 1022471 A3 20020508; DE 19901889 A1 20000921; DE 19901889 B4 20040325

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021109

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 15B 13/00 A, 7F 16K 27/00 B, 7F 15B 13/01 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI