Global patent index - EP 1022510 A2

EP 1022510 A2 2000-07-26 - Multi-function vehicle taillight system with unitary optic

Title (en)

Multi-function vehicle taillight system with unitary optic

Title (de)

Multifunktions-Heckleuchte für Fahrzeuge mit einheitlicher Optik

Title (fr)

Système de feu arrière à fonctions multiples avec une optique unitaire pour automobiles

Publication

EP 1022510 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300285 A

Priority

US 23759299 A

Abstract (en)

A taillight system for an automotive vehicle has an optic manifold (26) mounted in a assembly defining a light emitting area, a first light source (12) configured to provide illumination through the light emitting area, and a second light source (22) configured to provide illumination through a predetermined portion of the light emitting area. The system has an illumination mode in which the first light source provides illumination of a first intensity in a first wavelength range through the light emitting area, a brake mode in which the first light source (12) provides illumination of a second intensity in the first wavelength range through the light emitting area, and a backup mode in which the second light source (22) provides illumination in a second wavelength range through the predetermined portion of the light emitting area, with or without the first light source providing illumination through the light emitting area, the second wavelength range including the first wavelength range. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21V 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); B60Q 1/26 (2006.01); F21V 8/00 (2006.01); G02B 6/00 (2006.01); F21W 101/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/002 (2013.01); B60Q 1/0011 (2013.01); B60Q 1/2607 (2013.01); F21S 48/215 (2013.01); F21S 48/2237 (2013.01); F21S 48/2268 (2013.01); F21S 48/2287 (2013.01); G02B 6/0048 (2013.01); G02B 6/0068 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022510 A2 20000726; EP 1022510 A3 20020313; EP 1022510 B1 20070404; DE 60034161 D1 20070516; DE 60034161 T2 20070816; JP 2000215710 A 20000804; US 6102559 A 20000815

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090117

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090117

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60034161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-05-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 8/10 20060101AFI20060920BHEP

2006-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G02B 6/00 20060101ALI20060920BHEP

2006-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21W 101/14 20060101ALI20060920BHEP

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI