Global Patent Index - EP 1022514 A1

EP 1022514 A1 2000-07-26 - Method and device for controlling the gaseous fuel flow

Title (en)

Method and device for controlling the gaseous fuel flow

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung des gasförmigen Brennstoffstromes

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de regulation d'un courant de combustible gazeux

Publication

EP 1022514 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400115 A

Priority

FR 9900680 A

Abstract (en)

The method comprises altering the calorific value of the supply gas in relation to the operational parameters that the pre-set level determines. The calorific value is calculated as a function of the highest calorific value and the supply density of the combustion gas. The density of the combustion gas within the combustion mixture is adjusted to achieve the desired output. An Independent claim is included for an apparatus for the regulation of a combustible gas supply

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un procédé de régulation du pouvoir calorifique d'un courant de combustible gazeux du type gaz fossile comportant un gaz combustible majoritaire dit A et circulant dans une conduite. Cette régulation s'effectue au moins pour partie par ajout contrôlé dans le courant d'au moins un gaz combustible dit B de pouvoir calorifique supérieur à celui de A . L'invention a également pour objet son dispositif de mise en oeuvre et ses applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/00 (2006.01); C03B 5/00 (2006.01); C10L 3/00 (2006.01); F23N 1/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/00 (2006.01); F27D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/002 (2013.01); F23N 2021/10 (2013.01); F23N 2037/08 (2013.01); Y10T 137/2509 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0075369 A1 19830330 - NEDERLANDSE GASUNIE NV [NL]
  • [XA] DE 1234160 B 19670216 - GASELAN VEB
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 079 (M - 204) 31 March 1983 (1983-03-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 011 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 416 (M - 759) 4 November 1988 (1988-11-04)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 395 (M - 1451) 23 July 1993 (1993-07-23)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022514 A1 20000726; EP 1022514 B1 20030709; AT 244857 T 20030715; CZ 20000247 A3 20001011; CZ 297204 B6 20061011; DE 60003729 D1 20030814; DE 60003729 T2 20040527; DK 1022514 T3 20031027; ES 2203402 T3 20040416; FR 2788839 A1 20000728; FR 2788839 B1 20010420; JP 2000220820 A 20000808; PL 190981 B1 20060228; PL 337960 A1 20000731; PT 1022514 E 20031128; SK 284947 B6 20060302; SK 822000 A3 20000912; US 2003000574 A1 20030102; US 6495731 B1 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170103

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170102

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ, FR

- Document: AT 244857 T

- Effective date: 20130328

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GAZ DE FRANCE, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60003729

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60003729

- Representative's name: WSL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-10-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60003729

- Representative's name: WSL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2011-06-29 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-06-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-06-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-06-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2010-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

2009-05-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ SOCIETE ANONYME

- Free text: GAZ DE FRANCE#23, RUE PHILIBERT DELORME#75017 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- GDF SUEZ SOCIETE ANONYME#12-26 RUE DU DOCTEUR LANCEREAUX#75008 PARIS (FR)

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203402 T3

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-10-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GAZ DE FRANCE

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LONZA A.G.

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003729 P 20030814

2003-07-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GAZ DE FRANCE

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV RO

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GAZ DE FRANCE

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GAZ DE FRANCE

2002-09-11 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000127;LV PAYMENT 20000127;RO PAYMENT 20000223

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000127;LV PAYMENT 20000127

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20000127;LV PAYMENT 20000127;MK;RO;SI