Global Patent Index - EP 1022517 A1

EP 1022517 A1 2000-07-26 - Door for pyrolytic oven

Title (en)

Door for pyrolytic oven

Title (de)

Tür für pyrolytischen Ofen

Title (fr)

Porte pour four pyrolytique

Publication

EP 1022517 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830024 A

Priority

EP 99830024 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a cold door for an oven, the door being characterized by highly efficient thermal insulation and cooling of the outer surface. In particular, the present invention relates to an oven door, particularly for a pyrolytic oven, comprising a support (16) to which are fixed an inner panel (21), against the oven mouth, and an outer panel (18), between which panels are a first intermediate panel (23) and a second intermediate panel (24), the said intermediate panels being separated by an intermediate gap (27) having air inlets (32) at the bottom of the door and air outlets (32') at the top of the door, in which the said inner panel (21) and the said first intermediate panel (23) are separated by an inner gap (26) and in which the said second intermediate panel (24) and the said outer panel (18) are separated by an outer gap (25), the said door being characterized in that the said intermediate gap (27) is separated from the said inner (26) and outer (25) gaps, in that the said outer gap (25) includes air inlets (20) situated at the top of the door and the said inner gap (26) includes air outlets (31') situated at the top of the door and in that the said outer (25) and inner (26) gaps are in communication at the bottom of the door, so that air enters via the said inlets (20) of the said outer gap (25) and leaves via the said outlets (31') of the said inner gap (26), creating a downward stream of air in the said outer gap (25) in the opposite direction to the separate, upward stream in the said intermediate gap (27), and an upward stream of air in the said inner gap (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/04; F24C 15/00; F24C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/00 (2006.01); F24C 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/04 (2013.01); F24C 15/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022517 A1 20000726; EP 1022517 B1 20040421

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021106

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI