Global patent index - EP 1022523 A1

EP 1022523 A1 2000-07-26 - Heat transfer device

Title (en)

Heat transfer device

Title (de)

Wärmeübertragungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transfert de chaleur

Publication

EP 1022523 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300530 A

Priority

  • GB 9900255 W
  • GB 9917570 A

Abstract (en)

A self cooling can (410) has water on a pre-wetted wick (478), in a chamber (417) and an adsorbent (418) in another chamber (419) communicable upon actuation of the can with the chamber. One or both of the chambers is at low pressure. Upon actuation the pressure over the wick drops, water vapour is absorbed by the absorbent from the internal atmosphere and more water evaporates from the wick to replace it, thereby causing a cooling effect. Heat generated in the absorbent may be contained by heat take-up means, such as phase change material (800) or microcapsules of high heat capacity material such as water. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 17/08; B01F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 17/08 (2006.01); F25D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 31/007 (2013.01); F25B 17/08 (2013.01); F25D 2331/805 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022523 A1 20000726; GB 0001602 D0 20000315; GB 2347202 A 20000830; GB 2347202 B 20031029

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDBREW S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030205

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI