Global Patent Index - EP 1022534 A2

EP 1022534 A2 2000-07-26 - Pistol

Title (en)

Pistol

Title (de)

Pistole

Title (fr)

Pistolet

Publication

EP 1022534 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810032 A

Priority

US 23304499 A

Abstract (en)

The pistol has a dismantling lever (96, 97), which when the lock (7) is in the open position, must be turned up from its basic position before it can be pulled out and the lock can be pulled forward beyond its basic position. The dismantling lever and handle have locks (e.g. 101) acting with each other so that the dismantling lever can only be moved to the dismantling position when the lock is open.

Abstract (de)

Die Pistole umfasst ein Griffstück (1) und einen darauf verschiebbaren Verschluss (7). Im Verschluss (7) ist ein nach vorn durch eine erste Feder (23) vorbelasteter Zündstift (17) verschiebbar, der eine Fangnase (36) hat. Im Griffstück (1) ist eine Abzugzunge (39) schwenkbar gelagert, an welcher eine Abzugschiene (43) angelenkt ist. Die Schiene (43) ist mit der Fangnase (36) derart wirkverbunden, dass die Fangnase (36) beim Vorlauf des Verschlusses (7) gefangen und die erste Feder (23) vorgespannt wird. Die Pistole hat einen Zerlegehebel, der in der geöffneten Stellung des Verschlusses (7) aus seiner Grundstellung hochgeschwenkt werden muss, bevor er ausgezogen und der Verschluss (7) nach vorn über seine Grundstellung abgezogen werden kann. Dadurch wird eine hohe Sicherheit, insbesondere vor Fehlmanipulationen beim Zerlegen der Pistole erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 11/00; F41A 15/12; F41A 19/31

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/36 (2006.01); F41A 17/72 (2006.01); F41A 19/13 (2006.01); F41A 19/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/32 (2013.01); F41A 17/36 (2013.01); F41A 17/72 (2013.01); F41A 19/13 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0077790 B1 19860723

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022534 A2 20000726; EP 1022534 A3 20020417; US 6263607 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020731

2003-02-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 41A 11/00 A, 7F 41A 19/31 B, 7F 41A 15/12 B, 7F 41A 17/36 B, 7F 41A 15/16 B, 7F 41A 19/13 B, 7F 41A 19/32 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI