Global Patent Index - EP 1022686 A3

EP 1022686 A3 2000-11-15 - System and method for subsidized printing of third party coupons for insertion into a specific mailpiece

Title (en)

System and method for subsidized printing of third party coupons for insertion into a specific mailpiece

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zum subventionierten Drucken von Drittenanbietergutscheinen zur Einführung in ein bestimmtes Poststück

Title (fr)

Système et procédé d'impression de coupons subventionné d'un tiers pour insertion dans un pli postal spécifique

Publication

EP 1022686 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99126146 A

Priority

US 22264298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022686A2] A system and method is provided for printing an advertisement for insertion into a mailpiece. A customer computer system (150) communicates with a mailing service provider data processing system (80). The customer computer system (150) transmits to the mailing service provider data processing system (80) an electronic copy of at least one mailing address and at least one corresponding document to be mailed to the mailing address. The mailing address is cleansed as necessary by the mailing service provider data processing system (80), which then identifies a subset of third party advertisements available for insertion into a mailpiece to be assembled with the corresponding document. Enclosures to be printed from the subset of third party advertisements are selected by the customer or automatically by mailing service provider data processing system based on advertisement profiles. The corresponding document and the selected enclosures are printed and then inserted into an envelope to form the assembled mailpiece. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00096 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00137 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00145 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00427 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00451 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00491 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00604 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022686 A2 20000726; EP 1022686 A3 20001115; EP 1022686 B1 20070307; CA 2293071 A1 20000630; CA 2293071 C 20041026; DE 69935406 D1 20070419; DE 69935406 T2 20071108

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69935406 P 20070419

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-03-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI