Global Patent Index - EP 1022700 A3

EP 1022700 A3 2001-04-11 - Light scattering fire detector

Title (en)

Light scattering fire detector

Title (de)

Streulichtbrandmelder

Title (fr)

Détecteur d'incendie par lumière dispersée

Publication

EP 1022700 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100651 A

Priority

DE 19902319 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022700A2] A procedure for recognizing fires is based on the evaluation of scattered light signals that measures two angles of dispersion in a fire detector fitted with a scattered light system. A microprocessor in the fire detector gets an alarm value from scattered light signals through comparison with an alarm threshold.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 17/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00 (2006.01); G08B 17/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/107 (2013.01); G06K 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022700 A2 20000726; EP 1022700 A3 20010411; EP 1022700 B1 20040303; AT 261163 T 20040315; DE 19902319 A1 20000727; DE 19902319 B4 20110630; DK 1022700 T3 20040405; ES 2215499 T3 20041016; HK 1028289 A1 20050422; PT 1022700 E 20040630; US 6218950 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170109

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120113

2014-02-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20140128

2014-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130715

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130113

2013-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130802

2013-10-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040401545

- Effective date: 20130802

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-08-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-08-26 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20130113

2013-07-23 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130715

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120114

2012-09-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOVAR G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005467

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120109

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20111229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20101215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060113

2005-04-22 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028289

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215499 T3

2004-10-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028289

2004-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-14 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401545

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005467 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV RO SI

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POLITZE, HEINER

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEMBA, MARTIN

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRIPPENDORF, TIDO

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVAR GMBH

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000210;LT PAYMENT 20000210;LV PAYMENT 20000210;RO PAYMENT 20000210;SI PAYMENT 20000210

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ESSER SECURITY SYSTEMS GMBH.

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000210;LT PAYMENT 20000210;LV PAYMENT 20000210;RO PAYMENT 20000210;SI PAYMENT 20000210

2000-08-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LIGHT SCATTERING FIRE DETECTOR

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000210;LT PAYMENT 20000210;LV PAYMENT 20000210;RO PAYMENT 20000210;SI PAYMENT 20000210