Global Patent Index - EP 1022730 A3

EP 1022730 A3 2001-05-02 - Method and apparatus for servo control of an optical disk reproducing/recording device

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for servo control of an optical disk reproducing/recording device

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Servosteuerung eines optischen Plattenwiedergabe- / -Aufzeichnungsgeräts

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de commande d'asservissement d'un appareil de reproduction / d'enregistrement pour disque optique

Publication

EP 1022730 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00101201 A

Priority

KR 19990002117 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022730A2] A method and apparatus for control of a feed motor for an optical disk reproducing/recording device. If the center of an objective lens deviates from the optical axis beyond a predetermined level, a stepping motor 110 driven by digital pulses moves the optical pickup 2 so that the deviation decreases. Since the stepping motor 110 is precisely controllable by the drive pulses, stable tracking capability is attainable even in the case where operating environment such as temperature changes. The method in accordance with the present invention comprises the steps of detecting the distance between the center of an objective lens and an optical axis, checking whether the detected distance exceeds a prescribed range, and changing the magnitude of each drive signal by a microstep depending upon the check result and applying the drive signals to a sled motor for moving an optical pickup 2 containing the objective lens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/085; G11B 7/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/09 (2006.01); G11B 7/085 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/0901 (2013.01); G11B 7/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022730 A2 20000726; EP 1022730 A3 20010502; EP 1022730 B1 20060607; DE 60028429 D1 20060720; DE 60028429 T2 20070104; KR 100312615 B1 20011103; KR 20000051580 A 20000816; US 6693861 B1 20040217

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60028429

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60028429 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040325

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 11B 7/085 A, 7G 11B 7/09 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI