Global Patent Index - EP 1022749 A1

EP 1022749 A1 2000-07-26 - Electrostatic capacitive divided-voltage transformer

Title (en)

Electrostatic capacitive divided-voltage transformer

Title (de)

Elektrostatischer kapazitiver Spannungsteiler

Title (fr)

Diviseur de tension capacitif électrostatique

Publication

EP 1022749 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00101081 A

Priority

  • JP 1376099 A
  • JP 30211799 A

Abstract (en)

An electrostatic capacitive divided-voltage transformer, basically includes: a conductor (2); an inner semiconductive layer (3); a main insulative layer (4); an outer semiconductive layer (5), the conductor being enclosed with the inner semiconductive layer, the main insulative layer, and the outer semiconductive layer in this sequence; a first metallic layer (6), the first metallic layer enclosing the outer semiconductive layer; an auxiliary insulative layer (7) arranged on the first metallic layer; and a second metallic layer (8) arranged on the auxiliary insulative layer, a divided voltage from a whole voltage between the conductor and the second metallic layer being enabled to be led between the first metallic layer and second metallic layer. The electrostatic capacitive divided-voltage transformer is applicable to a voltage detector together with a digital meter or digital relay. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 30/12 (2006.01); H01B 9/02 (2006.01); H01B 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 38/24 (2006.01); H02B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022749 A1 20000726; EP 1022749 B1 20060906; DE 60030496 D1 20061019; DE 60030496 T2 20070201; JP 2000277363 A 20001006

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-08-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070607

2007-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60030496 P 20061019

2006-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040524

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI