Global patent index - EP 1022758 A2

EP 1022758 A2 2000-07-26 - Vacuum switch

Title (en)

Vacuum switch

Title (de)

Vakuumschaltröhre

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à vide

Publication

EP 1022758 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100945 A

Priority

DE 19902498 A

Abstract (en)

To improve the rated current and to remove heat from the surface of the contacts, the surface area of at least one contact carrier is enlarged by forming a hole (201) that is exposed to atmospheric pressure. The hole is aligned axially with the end of the contact carrier that extends out of the vacuum switch chamber.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vakuumschaltröhre mit einem in einer Vakuumschaltkammer angeordneten Hubleiter, umfassend einen Kontaktträger und ein Kontaktstück, sowie einen Festleiter, umfassend einen Kontaktträger und ein Kontaktstück und eine gegebenenfalls zylinderförmige die Kontaktstücke beabstandet umgebende Abschirmung, wobei die Vakuumschaltkammer von zwei über einen Isolatorring verbundenen metallischen Deckelteilen gebildet ist, in denen jeweils einer der Kontaktträger befestigt und aus der Vakuumschaltkammer herausgeführt ist, wobei zur Verbesserung der Nennstromtragfähigkeit und Ableitung von Wärme von der Oberfläche der Kontaktstücke die Oberfläche mindestens eines Kontaktträgers durch Ausbildung einer axialen zum aus der Vakuumschaltkammer herausgeführten Ende des Kontaktträgers verlaufenden Bohrung, die an Atmosphärendruck angrenzt, vergrößert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66; H01H 1/62; H01H 9/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/62 (2006.01); H01H 33/66 (2006.01); H01H 9/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/62 (2013.01); H01H 33/6606 (2013.01); H01H 9/52 (2013.01); H01H 33/66207 (2013.01); H01H 2009/523 (2013.01); H01H 2009/526 (2013.01); H01H 2033/6613 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022758 A2 20000726; EP 1022758 A3 20010502; DE 19902498 A1 20000907; DE 19902498 C2 20010517

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041223

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI