Global Patent Index - EP 1022759 A3

EP 1022759 A3 2001-05-02 - Method of manufacturing a contact for a vacuum switch

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing a contact for a vacuum switch

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Kontaktanordnung für eine Vakuumschaltröhre

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un contact pour interrupteur à vide

Publication

EP 1022759 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100966 A

Priority

DE 19902499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022759A2] The method involves forming a contact piece from a blank (21a) of sintered metal matrix whose melting point is above 1400 degrees C. The blank placed in a casting mould in the shape of a contact arrangement of a contact piece and contact carrier, and the mould is filled with copper powder (4). The mould is heated in a vacuum to the melting point of the copper powder. The resultant single-piece contact arrangement is then removed after cooling and solidification.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66; H01H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/02 (2006.01); H01H 33/664 (2006.01); H01H 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/664 (2013.01); H01H 1/0203 (2013.01); H01H 11/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022759 A2 20000726; EP 1022759 A3 20010502; DE 19902499 A1 20000907; DE 19902499 C2 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050802

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI