Global Patent Index - EP 1022804 A2

EP 1022804 A2 2000-07-26 - Reflector arrangement

Title (en)

Reflector arrangement

Title (de)

Reflektoranordung

Title (fr)

Arrangement de reflecteur

Publication

EP 1022804 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100799 A

Priority

  • EP 00100799 A
  • EP 99101155 A

Abstract (en)

A parabolic mirror reflector (2) has a plastic layer (9) with plastic foil (8) on it and an aluminum structure. Its casing (3) consists of two hollow cylinders (6,7) that fit into each other holding the reflector between them. The reflector has a further plastic layer (10) that forms a hollow cylindrical collar (11) on the reflector's edge. This collar is held between the casing's hollow cylinders.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Reflektoranordnung mit einem Reflektor (2), insbesondere einem Parabolspiegel, mit einer Kunststoffschicht (9) auf der eine Kunststoffolie (8) mit einer Struktur aus Metall vorgesehen ist und mit einem Gehäuse (3) bestehend aus zwei Hohlzylindern (6,7), die ineinander angeordnet werden können und zwischen denen der Reflektor (2) gehalten ist, angegeben, wobei der Reflektor (2) eine weitere Kunststoffschicht (10) aufweist, die am Reflektorrand einen im wesentlichen hohlzylindrischen Kragen (11) bildet, und wobei dieser Kragen (11) zwischen den Hohlzylindern des Gehäuses (3) gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 15/142 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022804 A2 20000726; EP 1022804 A3 20031105

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-09-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI