Global Patent Index - EP 1022928 A3

EP 1022928 A3 2002-11-27 - Apparatus for and a method of improving the sound quality of loudspeakers

Title (en)

Apparatus for and a method of improving the sound quality of loudspeakers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Tonqualitätsverbessurung von Lautsprechern

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour améliorer la qualité du son dans les haut-parleur

Publication

EP 1022928 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00300282 A

Priority

GB 9901187 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022928A2] Apparatus for improving the sound quality of loudspeakers, comprises a rigid shell (10) having sound absorbing material (15) on its internal surface. The shell is adapted to fit over a loudspeaker enclosure (16) and the front of the shell is open or substantially open or is covered by material which permits sound to pass therethrough in an undistorted manner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022928 A2 20000726; EP 1022928 A3 20021127; GB 0000834 D0 20000308; GB 2346030 A 20000726; GB 9901187 D0 19990310

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI