Global Patent Index - EP 1022991 A1

EP 1022991 A1 2000-08-02 - AMPOULES HOLDING AN INJECTABLE LIQUID

Title (en)

AMPOULES HOLDING AN INJECTABLE LIQUID

Title (de)

EINE INJEKTIERBARE FLÜSSIGKEIT ENTHALTENDE AMPULLE

Title (fr)

AMPOULES CONTENANT UN LIQUIDE INJECTABLE

Publication

EP 1022991 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949359 A

Priority

  • US 9819377 W
  • US 93534297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915096A1] An ampoule (1) having a bottom portion (4) serving as trap (5) for precipitated solid particulate contaminants, and a circumferential constriction (3) sidewall portion which when the ampoule is titled serves as a liquid sump, whereby essentially contaminant free liquid can be withdrawn from the ampoule.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 19/00; B65D 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 19/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/06 (2006.01); B65D 1/09 (2006.01); B65D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/09 (2013.01); A61J 1/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915096 A1 19990401; AU 9569798 A 19990412; DK 1022991 T3 20130429; EP 1022991 A1 20000802; EP 1022991 A4 20040407; EP 1022991 B1 20130213; ES 2408697 T3 20130621; PT 1022991 E 20130506; SI 1022991 T1 20130731

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161005

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160915

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20150907

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-27 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69842960

- Effective date: 20131114

2014-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131114

2013-08-30 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20130400921

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-06-21 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2408697 T3

- Effective date: 20130621

2013-06-12 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2013-05-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2013-05-06 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-04-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2013-04-11 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69842960

- Effective date: 20130411

2013-03-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2013-02-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 596055 T

- Effective date: 20130215

2013-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2013-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2013-02-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 19/00 20060101AFI20120518BHEP

2012-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 41/00 20060101ALI20120518BHEP

2012-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61J 1/06 20060101ALI20120518BHEP

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060628

2004-04-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040219

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000425;LT PAYMENT 20000425;LV PAYMENT 20000425;MK PAYMENT 20000425;RO PAYMENT 20000425;SI PAYMENT 20000425