Global Patent Index - EP 1023045 A2

EP 1023045 A2 2000-08-02 - DELIVERY VEHICLES FOR BIOACTIVE AGENTS AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

DELIVERY VEHICLES FOR BIOACTIVE AGENTS AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

VERABREICHUNGSTRÄGER FÜR BIOAKTIVEN WIRKSTOFFEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

VEHICULES DE FOURNITURE D'AGENTS BIOACTIFS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 1023045 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98955098 A

Priority

  • US 9822552 W
  • US 6311497 P
  • US 95669497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9921533A2] Compositions for transporting a bioactive agent across a biological membrane include the bioactive agent, an oil, an oil-immiscible compound and a noncationic surface active agent. The compositions may deliver the bioactive agent through a chemical microporulation mechanism, which allows transfer of the agent across both cellular, intracellular organelle, and nuclear membranes. Compositions for nucleic acid delivery include nucleic acid, oil, oil-immiscible compound, noncationic surface active agent and essentially no cationic lipid, or include nucleic acid, oil, oil-immiscible compound and two noncationic surface active agents. The nucleic acid may be hydrophobically-modified, and be in combination with an oil, an oil-immiscible compound and at least one surface active agent. The compositions may be used for gene delivery to a cell, as well as delivery of other therapeutic agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/107; A61K 48/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/1075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921533A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9921533 A2 19990506; WO 9921533 A3 19990708; AU 1198599 A 19990517; CA 2306090 A1 19990506; EP 1023045 A2 20000802

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1030877

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031202

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEORX CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOUTHERN RESEARCH INSTITUTE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE