Global patent index - EP 1023083 A1

EP 1023083 A1 2000-08-02 - VETERINARY VACCINES

Title (en)

VETERINARY VACCINES

Title (de)

VETERINÄR-IMPFSTOFFE

Title (fr)

VACCINS VETERINAIRES

Publication

EP 1023083 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949828 A

Priority

  • AU 9800865 W
  • GB 9722035 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920305A1] The invention relates to vaccines which are suitable for the prevention of clostridial diseases of sheep (and lambs), providing an effective immunity for up to a year or more following a single injection or dose.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/08; A61K 9/107; A61K 47/14; A61K 47/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 39/08 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61K 47/06 (2006.01); A61K 47/14 (2006.01); A61K 47/44 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/39 (2013.01); A61K 9/0019 (2013.01); A61K 9/107 (2013.01); A61K 39/08 (2013.01); A61K 47/06 (2013.01); A61K 47/14 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55566 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920305 A1 19990429; WO 9920305 A8 19990708; AU 753804 B2 20021031; AU 9616198 A 19990510; CA 2307000 A1 19990429; CA 2307000 C 20110104; EP 1023083 A1 20000802; EP 1023083 A4 20060614; NZ 503636 A 20020531

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090505

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061215

2006-06-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20060517

2004-02-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000404;LT PAYMENT 20000404;LV PAYMENT 20000404;MK PAYMENT 20000404;RO PAYMENT 20000404;SI PAYMENT 20000404