Global Patent Index - EP 1023104 A1

EP 1023104 A1 2000-08-02 - CONTROLLED ACTION, MANUALLY OPERABLE FLUID APPLICATOR

Title (en)

CONTROLLED ACTION, MANUALLY OPERABLE FLUID APPLICATOR

Title (de)

KONTOLLIERTE BETÄTIGUNG EINES MANUELLEN FLÜSSIGKEITSAPPLIKATORS

Title (fr)

APPLICATEUR DE FLUIDE A ACTION MANUELLE CONTROLEE

Publication

EP 1023104 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98952105 A

Priority

  • US 9821045 W
  • US 94636497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917834A1] The invention provides a handheld, manually operable fluid applicator, particularly suited to the needs of surgeons, which can dispense multiple medically useful fluids, for example fibrin and thrombin components of a tissue adhesive, and which has a smooth feel and action. The applicator has a novel actuator mechanism (22, 44, and 46) providing a comparatively higher mechanical advantage in a commencement phase of the actuator stroke and a comparatively lower mechanical advantage in a completion phase of the actuator stroke.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/11 (2006.01); B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); A61M 5/315 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/00491 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00367 (2013.01); A61M 5/31581 (2013.01); A61M 5/31595 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917834 A1 19990415; AU 750676 B2 20020725; AU 9787998 A 19990427; CA 2306067 A1 19990415; EP 1023104 A1 20000802; EP 1023104 A4 20080611; JP 2001518387 A 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-06-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080508

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC.

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE