Global Patent Index - EP 1023105 A1

EP 1023105 A1 2000-08-02 - DEVICE FOR USE IN BIONE OR ORGONE THERAPY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR USE IN BIONE OR ORGONE THERAPY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BION- ODER ORGONTHERAPIE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF S'UTILISANT DANS LA BIONOTHERAPIE OU L'ORGONOTHERAPIE, AINSI QUE PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1023105 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936309 A

Priority

  • DE 9901534 W
  • DE 19822738 A
  • DE 29809090 U
  • DE 19902369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961099A2] The invention relates to a device for use in bione or orgone therapy, consisting essentially of a certain amount of concentrated/informed quartz powder (5) and a device for accommodating said quartz powder(5), said device comprising a base body (1) in the shape of a compress, a cuff, a bandage or similar, consisting of plastic, rubber or a similar material. The quartz powder is mixed with said plastic, rubber or similar material. According to the invention, bione accumulators (1, 20) are used for carrying out the orgone therapy. Said bione accumulators consist essentially of a Dr. Wilhelm Reich accumulator which is configured in such a way that a quartz element (5, 25) and a UV-light source (4, 24) are provided. Said quartz element (5, 25) is arranged in such a way that it is caused to vibrate at least partially by the UV-light source (4, 24) and is hereby informed with energy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61N 1/32; A61N 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/16 (2006.01); A61N 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/16 (2013.01); A61N 5/0613 (2013.01); A61N 2005/0644 (2013.01); A61N 2005/0661 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961099A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961099 A2 19991202; WO 9961099 A3 20021024; EP 1023105 A1 20000802

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060516

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030516

2002-12-11 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLLERT, KAI

2002-06-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VOLLERT, KAI

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLLERT, KAI

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VOLLERT, KAI

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000210

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE