Global patent index - EP 1023119 A1

EP 1023119 A1 2000-08-02 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INTRODUCTION OF A FIRST FLUID INTO A SECOND FLUID

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INTRODUCTION OF A FIRST FLUID INTO A SECOND FLUID

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM EINFÜHREN EINES ERSTEN FLUIDS IN EIN ZWEITES FLUID

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'INTRODUIRE UN PREMIER FLUIDE DANS UN DEUXIEME FLUIDE

Publication

EP 1023119 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950568 A

Priority

  • SE 9801842 W
  • SE 9703732 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919057A1] A method and apparatus for introduction of a first fluid into a second fluid, that flows in a conduit. A first member with a pass-through canal for said second fluid, is at least partially encircled by a chamber with a wall between the inner part of the chamber and the pass-through canal, and a pressurized source of first fluid which is to be supplied into the chamber. At least one series of apertures is distributed about the periphery of the wall, extending therethrough, such that the first fluid is introduced through the apertures to be mixed into the second fluid based upon the pressure differential between the pressure in the chamber and the pressure in the pass-through canal. At least a portion of the apertures may be selectively blocked or closed to regulate the flow of the first fluid into the pass-through canal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/06; D21C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/04 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01); D21C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/0201 (2013.01); B01F 5/0475 (2013.01); B01F 5/0485 (2013.01); B01F 15/0261 (2013.01); D21C 9/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919057A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919057 A1 19990422; AT 243069 T 20030715; AU 9657598 A 19990503; CA 2306171 A1 19990422; CA 2306171 C 20060919; DE 69815704 D1 20030724; DE 69815704 T2 20040429; EP 1023119 A1 20000802; EP 1023119 B1 20030618; SE 510686 C2 19990614; SE 9703732 D0 19971014; SE 9703732 L 19990415; ZA 9809381 B 20000629

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69815704

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101013

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101013

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-26 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20050610

2004-07-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-05-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER SUNDSVALL ABMESTO PAPER SUNDSVALL AB

- Effective date: 20040316

2003-09-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-09-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69815704

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT

2003-06-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020610

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT