Global patent index - EP 1023128 A4

EP 1023128 A4 2000-10-04 - MEMORY DISC SUBSTRATE WITH DEFECT FREE SURFACE

Title (en)

MEMORY DISC SUBSTRATE WITH DEFECT FREE SURFACE

Title (de)

SUBSTRAT FÜR SPEICHERPLATTE MIT FEHLERFREIER OBERFLÄCHE

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE DISQUE MEMOIRE A SURFACE EXEMPTE DE DEFAUTS

Publication

EP 1023128 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98935960 A

Priority

  • US 9815275 W
  • US 5441497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906154A1] The present invention is directed to a defect-free magnetic memory disc substrate (1, 2). In particular, it is directed to a composite alumina-based, glass-coated, article (1, 2) with a defect free surface. Several methods for its manufacture including frit bonding, molten glass submersion and tape formation are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/18; B05D 3/02; B05D 5/12; B32B 3/02; B32B 15/00; B32B 17/06; G11B 5/72; G11B 5/82; G11B 5/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/00 (2006.01); B32B 3/02 (2006.01); B32B 15/00 (2006.01); B32B 17/06 (2006.01); C03C 3/087 (2006.01); C04B 37/04 (2006.01); C04B 41/86 (2006.01); G11B 5/73 (2006.01); G11B 5/84 (2006.01); G11B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/7325 (2013.01); B32B 17/06 (2013.01); C03C 3/087 (2013.01); G11B 5/8404 (2013.01); G11B 23/0064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4808463 A 19890228 - YOSHIKATSU OKABAYASHI [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 289 (P - 405) 15 November 1985 (1985-11-15)
  • See also references of WO 9906154A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906154 A1 19990211; DE 69823854 D1 20040617; DE 69823854 T2 20050428; EP 1023128 A1 20000802; EP 1023128 A4 20001004; EP 1023128 B1 20040512; JP 2001511579 A 20010814; US 5993914 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060723

2007-03-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1026657

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060723

2005-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-06-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69823854

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030307

2000-10-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 05D 1/18 A, 7B 05D 3/02 B, 7B 05D 5/12 B, 7B 32B 3/02 B, 7B 32B 15/00 B, 7B 32B 17/06 B, 7G 11B 5/72 B, 7G 11B 5/82 B, 7G 11B 5/84 B

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL