Global patent index - EP 1023132 A1

EP 1023132 A1 2000-08-02 - HYDRAULIC DRIVE SYSTEM FOR FORGING PRESS OR FORGING MACHINE SLIDES

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC DRIVE SYSTEM FOR FORGING PRESS OR FORGING MACHINE SLIDES

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR STÖSSEL VON SCHMIEDEPRESSEN ODER SCHMIEDEMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT HYDRAULIQUE POUR PRESSE A FORGER OU COULISSEAUX DE MACHINE A FORGER

Publication

EP 1023132 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955381 A

Priority

  • DE 9802975 W
  • DE 19745505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919096A1] The invention relates to a hydraulic drive system for the tool-bearing slide of a forging press or a forging machine. The slide (6) is configured as a piston (6) and is provided with a valve seat (19) at the opposite end to the tool, that is, the end which is impinged upon by pressure means. Together with a valve lifter (18) driven by an actuator (26), said valve seat (19) forms a valve which is able to connect the cylinder chamber to a pressureless discharge pipe (17) and therefore control the stroke of the piston (6). In order to reduce the mass and the axial construction length of the inventive drive system, the piston (6) is hollow over a portion of its length from the end which is impinged upon, and is provided with the valve seat (19) at the base of the hollow. The valve lifter (18) which can be axially displaced in the cylinder lid (11) is tubular in shape and is provided with side channels (25) connecting its inner cavity to a pressureless discharge pipe (17) for the pressure means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 7/28; B21J 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 7/14 (2006.01); B21J 7/28 (2006.01); B30B 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 7/28 (2013.01); B21J 7/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919096A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919096 A1 19990422; AT 211036 T 20020115; DE 19846348 A1 19990422; DE 29817969 U1 19990218; EP 1023132 A1 20000802; EP 1023132 B1 20011219; JP 2001519241 A 20011023; JP 3345400 B2 20021118; US 6401516 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141008

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111008

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 211036

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111008

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120629

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802571

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-31

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 211036

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010503

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT