Global Patent Index - EP 1023188 A1

EP 1023188 A1 2000-08-02 - COMPRESSION MOLDED, INSERTED THERMOSET DOOR LIGHT FRAMES, PLANT-ON MOLDINGS, AND DECORATIVE PANELS

Title (en)

COMPRESSION MOLDED, INSERTED THERMOSET DOOR LIGHT FRAMES, PLANT-ON MOLDINGS, AND DECORATIVE PANELS

Title (de)

FORMGEPRESSTER , WÄRMEHÄRTENDER UND EINSETZBARER RAHMEN FÜR FENSTER IN TÜREN, EINBAUGUSSTEILE UND DEKORATIVE PANELE

Title (fr)

CADRES DE PORTES INSERABLES MOULES PAR COMPRESSION, MOULURES RAPPORTEES ET PANNEAUX DECORATIFS D'UN MATERIAU THERMODURCISSABLE

Publication

EP 1023188 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953523 A

Priority

  • US 9821736 W
  • US 6239997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919153A1] Door assemblies contain compression molded skins (1, 4) and separately manufactured door light frames, panels, and/or plant-on molding (10) comprised of a thermoset material wherein the separately molded members display substantially the same stainability, gloss, texture, etc., as the compression molded skins (1, 4), and are further strippable without damage to the member. The non-integral door elements may be adhesively bonded to the surface onto which they are affixed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44F 7/00; E06B 3/58; E06B 3/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44C 3/00 (2006.01); E06B 3/58 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5892 (2013.01); E06B 3/7001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919153 A1 19990422; CA 2306368 A1 19990422; EP 1023188 A1 20000802; EP 1023188 A4 20040414; JP 2001519496 A 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050207

2004-04-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 44F 7/00 A

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 06B 3/58 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 06B 3/70 B

2003-02-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB