Global Patent Index - EP 1023210 A1

EP 1023210 A1 2000-08-02 - WIPER BLADE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WINDSHIELD WIPER DEVICE

Title (en)

WIPER BLADE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WINDSHIELD WIPER DEVICE

Title (de)

WISCHBLATT FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGSCHEIBENWISCHVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

RACLETTE D'ESSUIE-GLACE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1023210 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956845 A

Priority

  • DE 19745460 A
  • EP 9806499 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19745460A1] The wiper blade has a rubber wiper (1) supported by a wiper blade frame (2) having a number of pivot hoops (5-7), arranged in a hierarchy structure, secured to a driven wiper arm. A guide element (15) is provided by a cladding (10) for the higher hierarchy pivot hoops (5,6) of the wiper blade frame, for preventing the sidewards displacement of the lower hierarchy pivot hoops (6,7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60S 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60S 1/32 (2006.01); B60S 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60S 1/32 (2013.01); B60S 1/3801 (2013.01); B60S 1/3806 (2013.01); B60S 2001/3813 (2013.01); B60S 2001/3843 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919186A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19745460 A1 19990422; EP 1023210 A1 20000802; WO 9919186 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2004-02-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO WISCHERSYSTEME GMBH

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030519

2002-11-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO WISCHERSYSTEME GMBH

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000222

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT