Global Patent Index - EP 1023228 A4

EP 1023228 A4 2000-08-02 - DEVICE FOR FORMING A MOUTH IN A CONTAINER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR FORMING A MOUTH IN A CONTAINER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM UMFORMEN EINER BEHÄLTERMÜNDUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF FORMANT UN BEC VERSEUR DE CONTENANT

Publication

EP 1023228 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97923418 A

Priority

  • JP 13285596 A
  • US 9706375 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9741040A1] A mouth forming device (10) for a container includes an opening section (11), an operating section (12) and a supporting section (13) which are disposed in substantially the same plane. A substantially U-shaped groove is provided between one end portion (11a) of the opening section (11) and one end portion (12a) of the operating section (12). The supporting section (13) surrounds the opening section (11) and part of the operating section (12). The operating section (12) is linked to and supported by section (13) through axles (15). The opening section (11), the operating section (12) and the supporting section (13) are integrated through a thin wall portion and the support axles by molding. When the other end portion (12b) of the operating section (12) is raised, axles (15) are twisted and section (13) rotates about axles (15) to close groove (14). Accordingly, end portion (11a) is pressed by end portion (12b) and the part of the container located beneath the opening section (11) is opened by the opening section (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 17/50; B65D 5/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/74 (2006.01); B65D 17/30 (2006.01); B65D 17/50 (2006.01); B65D 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/748 (2013.01); B65D 17/506 (2013.01); B65D 2251/1008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9741040 A1 19971106; AU 2922897 A 19971119; DE 69728449 D1 20040506; DE 69728449 T2 20050120; EP 1023228 A1 20000802; EP 1023228 A4 20000802; EP 1023228 B1 20040331; JP 3607002 B2 20050105; JP H09301357 A 19971125; TW 342372 B 19981011

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110428

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110428

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110428

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69728449

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69728449

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69728449 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020418

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981102

2000-08-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT