Global Patent Index - EP 1023232 A1

EP 1023232 A1 2000-08-02 - BAG FOR TRANSPORTING AND INTERMEDIATE STORING OF BULK GOODS

Title (en)

BAG FOR TRANSPORTING AND INTERMEDIATE STORING OF BULK GOODS

Title (de)

TRANSPORT-UND LAGERUNGSSACK FÜR SCHÜTTGUT

Title (fr)

SAC POUR LE TRANSPORT ET L'ENTREPOSAGE DE MARCHANDISES EN VRAC

Publication

EP 1023232 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98920442 A

Priority

  • CH 9800224 W
  • CH 126097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854070A1] The invention concerns a bag for transporting and intermediate storing of bulk goods, more particularly designed to co-operate with the fork lift arms, comprising lifting straps (2) fixed along the bag vertical edges such that, when no external forces are exerted, the top (3) of the loop formed by each strap does not substantially exceed in height the bag top surface plane. The straps (2) are fixed in pairs in two groups, the straps of the same group being fixed on the same side of the bag so as to be stacked projecting frontwards. The straps (2) are linked in pairs by linking means (4) forming a tube, the linking means (4) consisting of pieces of cloth sewn on the straps and matching at least partially their outline.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/1681 (2013.01); B65D 88/1687 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854070A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854070 A1 19981203; AU 7329898 A 19981230; DE 69800810 D1 20010621; DE 69800810 T2 20020328; DK 1023232 T3 20010910; EP 1023232 A1 20000802; EP 1023232 B1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170606

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ST. DR. CAVATTONI ING. A. RAIMONDI

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800810 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE