Global Patent Index - EP 1023236 A1

EP 1023236 A1 2000-08-02 - TRACTION ELEVATOR SYSTEM USING A FLEXIBLE, FLAT ROPE AND A PERMANENT MAGNET MACHINE

Title (en)

TRACTION ELEVATOR SYSTEM USING A FLEXIBLE, FLAT ROPE AND A PERMANENT MAGNET MACHINE

Title (de)

TREIBSCHEIBENAUFZUGSYSTEM MIT FLEXIBLEM FLACHSEIL UND PERMANENTMAGNET-ANTRIEB

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ASCENSEUR A TRACTION DANS LEQUEL UN CABLE PLAT ET SOUPLE AINSI QU'UNE MACHINERIE A AIMANTS PERMANENTS SONT UTILISES

Publication

EP 1023236 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99936066 A

Priority

  • US 9903643 W
  • US 3110898 A
  • US 16941598 A
  • US 21899098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943590A1] A traction elevator system includes a machine having a rotor including permanent magnets and a flat rope engaged with the machine. The flat rope includes one or more load-carrying members retained within a common sheath from a non-metallic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 7/06; D07B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0438 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • US 4739696 A 19880426 - SHEEN SHUENN T [TW]
  • US 5783895 A 19980721 - HAKALA HARRI [FI], et al
  • ECKERSLEY G.P.: "New concepts in Elevator Drive Systems - Incorporating Synchronous AC Gearless Machines with Variable Frequency Control", LIFT-REPORT, vol. 17, no. 5, September 1991 (1991-09-01) - October 1991 (1991-10-01), pages 21 - 23, XP002959732
  • STRENG H.: "Interlift 97 - ein technischer Report", LIFT-REPORT, vol. 24, no. 1, January 1998 (1998-01-01) - February 1998 (1998-02-01), pages 6 - 9, XP002959733
  • GFRÖRER R.: "Gearless direct drive for elevators without a machine room", LIFT-REPORT, vol. 24, no. 5, September 1998 (1998-09-01) - October 1998 (1998-10-01), pages 49 - 52, XP002959734
  • PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 14 31 December 1998 (1998-12-31)
  • PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 11 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30)
  • PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 05 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)
  • PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 10 31 October 1997 (1997-10-31)
  • "Neue Idee von ContiTech - Hubgurte für Aufzüge", HANNOVER MESSE, 1998, pages 14 - 16, XP002959735
  • See also references of WO 9943590A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943590 A1 19990902; DE 69914577 C5 20141120; DE 69914577 D1 20040311; DE 69914577 T2 20050105; DE 69914577 T3 20090514; EP 1023236 A1 20000802; EP 1023236 B1 20040204; EP 1023236 B2 20090204; EP 1391413 A2 20040225; EP 1391413 A3 20061220; EP 1391413 B1 20141224; ES 2211130 T3 20040701; ES 2211130 T5 20090525; PT 1023236 E 20040630

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69914577

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170201

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-20 [REG DE R043] PATENT'S REVOCATION IN PART NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69914577

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-11-20 [REG DE R206] AMENDED PATENT SPECIFICATION

- Document: DE 69914577

- Effective date: 20141120

2014-04-10 [REG DE R043] PATENT'S REVOCATION IN PART NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69914577

2009-05-25 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2009-02-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090204

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2005-01-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INVENTIO AG

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-09-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211130 T3

2004-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914577 P 20040311

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT