Global Patent Index - EP 1023433 A1

EP 1023433 A1 2000-08-02 - AQUEOUS AGENTS FOR CLEANING HARD SURFACES

Title (en)

AQUEOUS AGENTS FOR CLEANING HARD SURFACES

Title (de)

WÄSSRIGE MITTEL FÜR DIE REINIGUNG HARTER OBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX AGENTS AQUEUX POUR NETTOYER DES SURFACES DURES

Publication

EP 1023433 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97940124 A

Priority

  • DE 19635554 A
  • EP 9704620 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19635554A1] The invention concerns novel aqueous agents for cleaning hard surfaces, said agents containing (a) monoglyceride (ether) sulphates and (b) mixed ethers and optionally (c) non-ionic and/or amphoteric or zwitterionic surfactants. The weakly foaming agents are characterized not only by their exceptional cleaning power but also by their particular dermatological compatibility.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 1/83

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/86 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 1/28 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0026 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/86 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 1/28 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/721 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9810051A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19635554 A1 19980305; DE 19635554 C2 20010531; AT 262028 T 20040415; EP 1023433 A1 20000802; EP 1023433 B1 20040317; ES 2218699 T3 20041116; WO 9810051 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130826

2014-09-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140905

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130825

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130825

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59711431

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130825

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121001

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121015

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2009-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218699 T3

2004-08-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711431 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990220

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT