Global Patent Index - EP 1023501 A1

EP 1023501 A1 2000-08-02 - COATED PAPER COMPRISING A PSEUDO-WATERMARK AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

COATED PAPER COMPRISING A PSEUDO-WATERMARK AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

BESCHICHTETES PAPIER MIT EINEM NACHGEAHMTEN WASSERZEICHEN, UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PAPIER COUCHE COMPORTANT UN PSEUDO-FILIGRANE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1023501 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98943968 A

Priority

  • FR 9801949 W
  • FR 9711441 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2768443A1] Preparing a coated paper with a pseudo water mark impression comprises application of an aqueous ethanolic solution, and then applying heat and pressure. Preparing a coated paper with a pseudo water mark impression comprises: (a) application of a re-wetting solution on one face of the coated paper in determined zones; and (b) application of pressure and heat to evaporate the solution and densify the paper in these zones. An Independent claim is also included for the prepared paper comprising a pseudo water mark in which the prepared zones have a reduced thickness compared thickness compared to the remainder of the paper, the surface weight being unaffected. The weight of the layer is identical in the treated zones and the remainder of the paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 25/06; B41M 3/10; D21H 19/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01); D21H 19/66 (2006.01); D21H 21/44 (2006.01); D21H 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2013.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.10); D21H 19/66 (2013.01); B41M 3/144 (2013.01); D21H 21/44 (2013.01); D21H 25/06 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24612 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24893 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914433A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768443 A1 19990319; FR 2768443 B1 19991015; AT 227377 T 20021115; AU 9167398 A 19990405; BR 9812454 A 20001003; DE 69809278 D1 20021212; DE 69809278 T2 20030828; DK 1023501 T3 20030303; EP 1023501 A1 20000802; EP 1023501 B1 20021106; ES 2190107 T3 20030716; PT 1023501 E 20030331; US 6630055 B1 20031007; WO 9914433 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-05-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-05-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100311

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ARJO WIGGINS PAPIERS COUCHES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-03-22 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100311

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081003

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080909

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190107 T3

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-03-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ARJO WIGGINS PAPIERS COUCHES

2003-03-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2003-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ARJO WIGGINS PAPIERS COUCHES

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809278 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227377 T 20021115

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE