Global Patent Index - EP 1023508 A1

EP 1023508 A1 2000-08-02 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING, INDEPENDENTLY OF LOAD PRESSURE, AND HOLDING THE LOAD OF A PLURALITY OF ROTATIONAL AND/OR TRANSLATIONAL USERS

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING, INDEPENDENTLY OF LOAD PRESSURE, AND HOLDING THE LOAD OF A PLURALITY OF ROTATIONAL AND/OR TRANSLATIONAL USERS

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR LASTDRUCKUNABHÄNGIGEN STEUERUNG UND LASTHALTUNG MEHRERER ROTATORISCHER UND/ODER TRANSLATORISCHER VERBRAUCHER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE INDEPENDANTE DE LA PRESSION DE LA CHARGE ET DE MAINTIEN DE LA CHARGE DE PLUSIEURS CONSOMMATEURS DE ROTATION ET/OU DE TRANSLATION

Publication

EP 1023508 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961094 A

Priority

  • DE 19745489 A
  • EP 9806215 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19745489A1] The control system uses a regulated pump and a secondary pressure balance with a spring-loaded regulating piston. The control elements for signal generation and signal compensation of the load sensing signal are contained in an upper housing section (78, 79) and the components (36, 73, 53, 75) providing the load holding function are contained in a releasable lower housing section (86, 87).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 11/00 (2006.01); F15B 11/05 (2006.01); F15B 11/16 (2006.01); F15B 13/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/2267 (2013.01); E02F 9/2232 (2013.01); E02F 9/226 (2013.01); E02F 9/2271 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01); F15B 11/003 (2013.01); F15B 11/05 (2013.01); F15B 11/16 (2013.01); F15B 13/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919571A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19745489 A1 19990422; DE 19745489 B4 20040722; EP 1023508 A1 20000802; EP 1023508 B1 20020502; JP 2001520335 A 20011030; WO 9919571 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-10-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-10-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020920

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020823

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804000 20020606

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: O&K ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010927

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000205

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE