Global Patent Index - EP 1023511 A1

EP 1023511 A1 2000-08-02 - CLOSING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

CLOSING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE, EN PARTICULIER POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1023511 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98949986 A

Priority

  • DE 19745149 A
  • EP 9805597 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6768413B1] A closing device for a vehicle door lock is actuated by a hand lever. The lock can be switched between a secured, inoperative position of the hand lever and an operative position in which the lock can be opened by the hand lever. An electric control device arranged within the vehicle effects via an antenna of a vehicle-correlated transmission and reception unit a data request directed to a data carrier external to the vehicle held by a vehicle user. The data carrier has a transmission and reception unit transmitting a data reply via the antenna of the vehicle-correlated transmission and reception unit to the control device which, for a positive identification of the data carrier, triggers securing, respectively, release of the lock. The antenna of the transmission and reception unit is arranged in the hand lever in addition to at least some further components of the transmission and reception unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); B60R 25/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 81/78 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5889 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919585A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6768413 B1 20040727; BR 9813042 A 20000815; EP 1023511 A1 20000802; EP 1023511 B1 20040324; EP 1023511 B2 20070411; ES 2214737 T3 20040916; JP 2001520337 A 20011030; JP 4337075 B2 20090930; WO 9919585 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-21 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59811066

- Effective date: 20140712

2014-07-12 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59811066

2010-12-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070829

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070903

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071207

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040824

2007-12-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-11-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040324

2007-07-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070722

2007-04-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070411

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060919

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060901

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KIEKERT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20041211

2005-02-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE

- Effective date: 20041222

2005-02-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KIEKERT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20041211

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214737 T3

2004-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811066 P 20040429

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030225

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE