Global Patent Index - EP 1023512 A1

EP 1023512 A1 2000-08-02 - LOCK MANAGING A PARAMETER RELATED TO THE SURROUNDINGS

Title (en)

LOCK MANAGING A PARAMETER RELATED TO THE SURROUNDINGS

Title (de)

SCHLOSS ZUR KONTROLLE DES ZEITLICHEN VERLAUFS EINES AN DIE UMGEBUNG GEBUNDENEN PARAMETERS

Title (fr)

SERRURE GERANT L'EVOLUTION D'UN PARAMETRE LIE A L'ENVIRONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1023512 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98954325 A

Priority

  • EP 98954325 A
  • EP 9806287 W
  • EP 97117767 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919586A1] The invention concerns a an access door lock (31) of a safe chamber set in premises. Said lock comprises a mechanism (33) capable of controlling, in response to an instruction, the locking and/or unlocking of the access door, storage means (43) containing reference data (X3) related to a parameter of the surroundings, and a processing unit (37) receiving said parameter reference data and measurement data (X2) and, in response, supplying the control instruction. Said arrangement provides the lock with autonomous management of the parameter evolution and centralised control for locking and/or unlocking. The storage means (43) can be arranged to provide the lock with the capacity to interpret "intelligently" events and occurrences taking place during its daily operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; G08B 29/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G08B 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/22 (2013.01); G07C 9/00912 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919586A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919586 A1 19990422; WO 9919586 A8 19990701; CA 2306431 A1 19990422; CA 2306431 C 20070424; DE 69828077 D1 20050113; DE 69828077 T2 20060302; EP 1023512 A1 20000802; EP 1023512 B1 20041208; ES 2235376 T3 20050701; US 6130611 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235376 T3

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828077 P 20050113

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABA AG

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000515

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI