Global Patent Index - EP 1023513 B1

EP 1023513 B1 2001-05-23 - FAIL SAFE LOCK, IN PARTICULAR FOR ELEVATING DEVICE LANDING DOOR

Title (en)

FAIL SAFE LOCK, IN PARTICULAR FOR ELEVATING DEVICE LANDING DOOR

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSSCHLOSS, INSBESONDERE FÜR AUFZUGSSCHACHTTÜR

Title (fr)

SERRURE A SECURITE POSITIVE, NOTAMMENT POUR PORTE PALIERE D'APPAREILS ELEVATEURS

Publication

EP 1023513 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98949058 A

Priority

  • FR 9802202 W
  • FR 9712835 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2769609A1] The lock (1) consists of a locking bolt (10), which slides within the box (16) and has a central hollow core (200), to cooperate with a striker (201), fitted solidly into the door frame (2). The mechanism is fitted to displace the bolt towards the extreme locked position, in which it is engaged in the door locking plate (20). An operating arm (15) controls the withdrawal of the bolt. The box also contains the device (7) to adjust the position of attack of the bolt Used for lift doors

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/06; B66B 13/18; B66B 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/18 (2006.01); B66B 13/20 (2006.01); E05B 63/06 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/06 (2013.01); B66B 13/185 (2013.01); B66B 13/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2769609 A1 19990416; FR 2769609 B3 20000107; BR 9814071 A 20000926; DE 69800840 D1 20010628; DE 69800840 T2 20020328; EP 1023513 A1 20000802; EP 1023513 B1 20010523; WO 9919587 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171010

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-19 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AUDE PRUDHOMME, FR

- Effective date: 20171211

2018-01-19 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ANAIS PRUDHOMME, FR

- Effective date: 20171211

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800840 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT