Global Patent Index - EP 1023515 A1

EP 1023515 A1 2000-08-02 - DOOR OR WINDOW HINGE PLATE

Title (en)

DOOR OR WINDOW HINGE PLATE

Title (de)

TÜR- ODER FENSTERBAND

Title (fr)

PAUMELLE DE PORTE OU DE FENETRE

Publication

EP 1023515 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98955455 A

Priority

  • DE 29718528 U
  • EP 9806533 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920864A1] The invention relates to a door or window hinge plate (10), comprising a flat hinge strap (12) which is located on the wing (11) of the door or window and whose edges project parallel to one another, a bearing bolt (15) being arranged at one end of each of said edges. Said bearing bolt (15) is held tightly from behind by a wall section (16) of the hinge strap (12). The inventive hinge plate also comprises a clamping plate (17) which clamps the hinge strap (12) on the wing (11) by activating fastening means which engage in said wing (11), as well as setting means (19) which displace the hinge strap (12) relatively between its edges when the hinge strap is not clamped in place, and a protective cap (20) which encompasses the hinge strap (12) and its clamping plate (17), and the bearing bolt (15). In order to provide stabilisation, especially with large wing loads, the hinge plate (10) is configured so that the hinge strap (12) has a cavity in its wall section (16) which corresponds to the circumference of the bearing bolt (15), the bearing bolt being accommodated in said cavity either directly or via a bearing sleeve (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/06; E05D 5/14; E05D 7/04; E05D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 5/14 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0054 (2013.01); E05D 5/023 (2013.01); E05D 5/14 (2013.01); E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/682 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920864A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718528 U1 19980219; EP 1023515 A1 20000802; EP 1023515 B1 20020116; PL 188352 B1 20050131; PL 339853 A1 20010115; WO 9920864 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151015

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151015

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802668

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141031

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111015

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HANS-DIETER NIEMANN, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 59802668

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NIEMANN, HANS-DIETER, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 59802668

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802668

- Representative's name: AXEL DRAUDT, DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802668

- Representative's name: DRAUDT, AXEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091015

2010-07-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NIEMANN HANS-DIETER

- Effective date: 20021031

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-06-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802668 20020221

2002-02-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE IT