Global Patent Index - EP 1023531 A1

EP 1023531 A1 2000-08-02 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MACHINE PISTON MOVEMENT, IMPLEMENTING DEVICE AND BALANCING OF SAID DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MACHINE PISTON MOVEMENT, IMPLEMENTING DEVICE AND BALANCING OF SAID DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTROLLIEREN DER HUBKOLBEN BEWEGUNG UND AUSGLEICHESVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DU MOUVEMENT DE PISTON DE MACHINE, DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE ET EQUILIBRAGE DU DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1023531 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98951534 A

Priority

  • FR 9802227 W
  • FR 9713313 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2769949A1] The method involves halting the piston at its tdc position for a set period so that operations can be carried out with a chamber at constant volume e.g. ignition and combustion in an i.c. engine, fuel injection in a diesel engine, gas or compressed air transfer in an i.c. engine or expansion chamber, or completion of exhaust. The method involves halting a piston at its tdc position for a set period so that operations can be carried out with a chamber at constant volume e.g. ignition and combustion in an i.c. engine, fuel injection in a diesel engine, gas or compressed air transfer in an i.c. engine or expansion chamber, or completion of exhaust. The movement of the piston (1) in its cylinder is controlled by two articulated rods (3, 4), one of which has a fixed end (6) while the other is connected to the piston pivot. The joint between the two rods is connected via a control lever (7) to a journal (8) of a crankshaft (9) located to one side of the axis of the piston's travel. The control lever (7) transfers the piston's reciprocating motion to the crankshaft, while the alignment of the two rods (3, 4) determines the duration of the time the piston spends in its tdc position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/32; F01B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01B 9/02 (2006.01); F01B 17/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/32 (2013.01); F01B 9/02 (2013.01); F01B 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920881A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2769949 A1 19990423; FR 2769949 B1 19991224; AP 200001775 D0 20000331; AT 243298 T 20030715; AU 741127 B2 20011122; AU 9751198 A 19990510; BG 104244 A 20001031; BR 9813084 A 20000822; CA 2306412 A1 19990429; CN 1272162 A 20001101; CZ 20000930 A3 20001213; CZ 295735 B6 20051012; DE 69815705 D1 20030724; DE 69815705 T2 20040603; DK 1023531 T3 20031006; EP 1023531 A1 20000802; EP 1023531 B1 20030618; ES 2210833 T3 20040701; HU 0003919 A2 20010428; HU 0003919 A3 20020228; IL 135681 D0 20010520; JP 2001521094 A 20011106; NO 20001698 A 20000529; NO 20001698 D0 20000403; NZ 504459 A 20001222; OA 12308 A 20060512; PL 340071 A1 20010115; PT 1023531 E 20031128; SK 3962000 A3 20020305; TR 200001032 T2 20000721; WO 9920881 A1 19990429; YU 21700 A 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071016

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051017

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-10-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-07-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-27 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTLA

- Effective date: 20041016

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-05-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-04-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2004-11-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-10-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041016

2004-10-16 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041016

2004-10-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041016

2004-08-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2210833

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031016

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. MOTOR DEVELOPMENT INTERNATIONAL S.A. *MDI

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040326

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-23 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031023

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031016

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030403669

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-10-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031015

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-06 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031006

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-10-03 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-18 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-12 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030812

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69815705

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4C] CORRECTIONS FOR GRANTED EUROPEAN PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4C

- Free Format Text: NOTIFICATION RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE PUBLICATION LANGUAGE IS ACTUALLY FRENCH.

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NEGRE, GUY

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NEGRE, CYRIL

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NEGRE, GUY

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NEGRE, CYRIL

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOCIETE MDI MOTOR DEVELOPMENT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020207

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000327;LT PAYMENT 20000327;LV PAYMENT 20000327;MK PAYMENT 20000327;RO PAYMENT 20000327;SI PAYMENT 20000327