Global Patent Index - EP 1023533 A1

EP 1023533 A1 2000-08-02 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES ELEKTROMECHANISCHEN STELLGERÄTS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN APPAREIL DE REGLAGE ELECTROMECANIQUE

Publication

EP 1023533 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952541 A

Priority

  • DE 9802599 W
  • DE 19745536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919615A1] An actuating device has an actuating element (12) and an actuating drive (11). Said actuating drive has at least one electromagnet with a coil (113), a moveable retaining plate (117) and at least one spring (118a, 118b) which prestresses the retaining plate into a predetermined neutral position (R). The coil generates a retarding field whilst the retaining plate moves away from the coil for a predetermined period of time (T2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; F01L 9/04; F02D 35/00; H01F 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 35/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01); H02K 33/12 (2006.01); H02P 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1844 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F02D 35/0007 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 13/0253 (2013.01); F02D 2041/001 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2027 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2031 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2037 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2079 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919615A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919615 A1 19990422; DE 19745536 C1 19990527; EP 1023533 A1 20000802; EP 1023533 B1 20020605; JP 2001520494 A 20011030; US 6483689 B1 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090902

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090902

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804352 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011024

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB