Global Patent Index - EP 1023534 A1

EP 1023534 A1 2000-08-02 - ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLED VALVE

Title (en)

ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLED VALVE

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCH ANSTEUERBARES VENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE A COMMANDE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1023534 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945315 A

Priority

  • DE 19745124 A
  • EP 9805682 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19745124C1] The invention concerns an electrically controlled valve (1), comprising a device (3) which, when it is triggered, countering a valve spring force, axially moves a valve stem with a valve body (10) which co-operates with a valve cage (2) seat (13) and defines a fluid passage through the valve, the valve stem being guided in the valve cage and forming between its guiding part and the valve body, with the valve cage, a ring-shaped space into which emerges a pressurised fluid conduit (12). The invention is characterised in that the contact surfaces between the valve body (10) and the valve seat (13) are limited, outwards, by a step, whereto is connected a guiding surface (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/46; F16K 31/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/466 (2013.01); F02M 63/0077 (2013.01); F02M 2200/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919622A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19745124 C1 19981015; BR 9813029 A 20000815; EP 1023534 A1 20000802; EP 1023534 B1 20021113; WO 9919622 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010629

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE